Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0020 (SB0403/CH0815)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 (SB0533)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541 (SB0910/CH0509)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 /CH0514
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0725
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0403 /CH0815 (HB0005/CH0020)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB1295)
Title
Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Claim for Damages - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910 /CH0509 (HB1541)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0020 (SB0403/CH0815) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Barkley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Economic Matters
1/18/2017 - 1:30 PM
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB1295 (SB0533) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1541 (SB0910/CH0509) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0289 /CH0514 Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Finance
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0290 /CH0725 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0403 /CH0815 (HB0005/CH0020) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Finance
2/21/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0533 (HB1295) Low-Cost Automobile Insurance Program Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Claim for Damages - Repeal Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 /CH0509 (HB1541) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM