Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0114
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Claim for Damages - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0379 /CH0114 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Commercial Policies - Notice and Quotes Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Economic Matters
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0208 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Claim for Damages - Repeal Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM