Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 (SB0598)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0626
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0627
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Workers' Compensation - Public Safety Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447 (SB1020)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455 /CH0687
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Multiuse Fields
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0598 (HB0602)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park Renovations
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1020 (HB1447)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center Renovations
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0602 (SB0598) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park Renovations Delegate Zucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0635 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Restrictions on Commissioners from Montgomery County MC/PG 102-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0637 /CH0626 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0627 Maryland-Washington Regional District - Boundaries - City of Laurel MC/PG 111-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 627
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 Workers' Compensation - Public Safety Employees Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 (SB1020) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center Renovations Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1455 /CH0687 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 687
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0549 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Multiuse Fields Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0598 (HB0602) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - West Fairland Local Park Renovations Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB1020 (HB1447) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Glassmanor Recreational Center Renovations Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM