Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0438
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0446
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0448
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0585 /CH0438 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 /CH0446 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulation of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles MC/PG 114-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0675 /CH0448 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1016 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program MC/PG 113-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM