Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0361
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Budget and Operation Study MC/PG 108-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0889)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 (SB0381)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Stewartown Local Park
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1636 /CH0455
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 (HB0558)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Stewartown Local Park
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Woods Hiker/Biker Connector Trail
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB0326)
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0321 /CH0361 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0322 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Budget and Operation Study MC/PG 108-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0323 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0326 (SB0889) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0558 (SB0381) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Stewartown Local Park Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 PM
HB1636 /CH0455 Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0381 (HB0558) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Stewartown Local Park Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Woods Hiker/Biker Connector Trail Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 10:00 AM
SB0889 (HB0326) Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page