Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0275)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 (SB0449)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045)
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0046)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB0166)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0045 (SB0069/CH0124) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0046 (SB0275) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0166 (SB0449) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0187 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0124 (HB0045) Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0275 (HB0046) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0371 Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0449 (HB0166) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM