Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193 (SB0067)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1631 (SB1168)
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 (HB1193)
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451)
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1168 (HB1631)
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0399 /CH0451 (SB0926/CH0450) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 (SB0067) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1631 (SB1168) Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0067 (HB1193) State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0926 /CH0450 (HB0399/CH0451) Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1168 (HB1631) Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulation - Explanatory Reasons Justifying Adoption Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page