Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Massage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0070
Title
Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598 /CH0797
Title
Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0309 /CH0070 Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1598 /CH0797 Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM