Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 /CH0605
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Commuter Benefits Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842
Title
Public Safety - Drug Treatment Court - Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB0627)
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local Hiring
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416
Title
Crimes - Gang-Free Zones - Penalties for Gang Activity
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491 /CH0657
Title
Transportation - Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red Line
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB1279)
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0772
Title
Transit Benefit Districts
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885
Title
State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - Participation
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0619 Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 /CH0605 Maryland Transit Administration - Commuter Benefits Program Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0842 Public Safety - Drug Treatment Court - Baltimore City Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1123 Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014 Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1279 (SB0627) Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1338 State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local Hiring Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1416 Crimes - Gang-Free Zones - Penalties for Gang Activity Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1491 /CH0657 Transportation - Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red Line Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0239 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB1279) Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax Limitations Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0772 Transit Benefit Districts Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0885 State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - Participation Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1035 Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM