Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 (SB0163)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 (SB0821)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 (HB0241)
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521
Title
Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - Labeling
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil Testing
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 (HB1104)
Title
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0241 (SB0163) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 (SB0821) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0163 (HB0241) Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 Agriculture - Meat and Poultry - Antibiotic Use - Labeling Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0739 Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil Testing Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 (HB1104) Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit Organizations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM