Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151
Title
Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine Meat
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 (SB0463)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 (SB0557)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886 (SB0533)
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 (SB0470)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463 (HB0701)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB1075)
Title
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533 (HB0886)
Title
Bay Tax Equity Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0557 (HB0760)
Title
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748
Title
Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0151 Maryland Wholesome Meat Act - Prohibitions - Equines and Equine Meat Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 (SB0463) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 (SB0557) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 (SB0533) Bay Tax Equity Act Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1075 (SB0470) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0463 (HB0701) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB1075) Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0533 (HB0886) Bay Tax Equity Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0557 (HB0760) Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0748 Deer Hunting - Crop Damage Permit - Wild Venison Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM