Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 (SB0496)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0607)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 (HB0599)
Title
Poultry Litter Management Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0698)
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0829)
Title
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0599 (SB0496) Poultry Litter Management Act Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 (SB0573) Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0607) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Agriculture - Veterinary Feed Directives - Information Collection Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 (HB0599) Poultry Litter Management Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 (HB0698) Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0607 (HB0829) Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0761 Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM