Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0120 /CH0101
Title
Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787)
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0120 /CH0101 Department of Agriculture - Seafood and Aquaculture Product Marketing Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 /CH0787 (SB0422/CH0788) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Delegate Robinson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0422 /CH0788 (HB0602/CH0787) Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017 Senator Pinsky 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 /CH0353 (HB0768) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM