Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Meat, Poultry, Seafood -see also- Clams; Crabs; Oysters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB0841)
Title
Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438
Title
Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 /CH0471 (SB0840/CH0472)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 /CH0496
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188
Title
Public Health - Misbranded Food - Meat Products
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0351
Title
Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 /CH0472 (HB1442/CH0471)
Title
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB1312)
Title
Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0589 Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB0841) Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1438 Agriculture – Processing of Poultry Litter for Alternative Use Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1442 /CH0471 (SB0840/CH0472) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Definition Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0009 /CH0496 Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 496
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2020 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 Public Health - Misbranded Food - Meat Products Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0351 Agriculture - Farmers Markets - Advertising, Labeling, and Enforcement (Farmers Market Integrity Act) Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 /CH0472 (HB1442/CH0471) Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - Definition Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0841 (HB1312) Water Pollution Control - Discharge Permits - Industrial Poultry Operations Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:20 PM