Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697 /CH0634 (SB0409)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 /CH0648
Title
Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0566 (SB0832/CH0565)
Title
Child Care - Dispute Resolution
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing Fee
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0167
Title
Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296)
Title
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB0697/CH0634)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 /CH0565 (HB0932/CH0566)
Title
Child Care - Dispute Resolution
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 (SB0305/CH0224) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 /CH0634 (SB0409) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0895 /CH0648 Education - Howard County Library System - Collective Bargaining Ho. Co. 3-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 /CH0566 (SB0832/CH0565) Child Care - Dispute Resolution Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1147 Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing Fee Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0167 Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 /CH0224 (HB0296) Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0409 (HB0697/CH0634) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Maryland Mediation Confidentiality Act - Applicability Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0832 /CH0565 (HB0932/CH0566) Child Care - Dispute Resolution Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM