Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 /CH0414
Title
Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0040)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 (SB0388)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice Programs
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0570)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0688)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027
Title
Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0385)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0791)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice Programs
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0829)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486)
Title
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0609 (HB1022)
Title
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0969)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136)
Title
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0346 /CH0414 Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to Magistrate Delegate Morales 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0385 (SB0040) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 PM
HB0388 (SB0602/CH0042) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0478 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0755 /CH0136 (SB0695/CH0135) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0791 (SB0388) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice Programs Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0570) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0966 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 (SB0688) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1027 Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0040 (HB0385) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB0791) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice Programs Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0570 (HB0829) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0595 /CH0311 (HB0486) Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 /CH0042 (HB0388) Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0609 (HB1022) State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB0969) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 /CH0135 (HB0755/CH0136) General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and Exemptions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM