Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0491 (SB0446)
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0670)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 (SB0652)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431
Title
Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0491)
Title
State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0871)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB0676)
Title
Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178)
Title
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1087
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Department of Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2017 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 /CH0178 (SB0909/CH0177) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0491 (SB0446) State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 (SB0670) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0871 (SB0652) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 Harford County Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Correctional Officers - Collective Bargaining Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (36-0)
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0491) State Personnel - Grievance Procedures - Exclusive Representatives Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0871) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0670 (HB0676) Condominiums - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions of Governing Documents Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0177 (HB0446/CH0178) Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety Officials Charles County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1087 Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM