Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347)
Title
Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0104
Title
Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0338)
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667 (SB0408)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 (SB0398)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811 /CH0022 (SB0819/CH0029)
Title
Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 /CH0395 (SB0607/CH0394)
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086
Title
Real Property - New Residential Construction - Correction of Drainage Defect
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1731
Title
Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346)
Title
Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 (HB0335)
Title
State Personnel – Grievance Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 (HB0747)
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0667)
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395)
Title
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 /CH0029 (HB0811/CH0022)
Title
Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee Processing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0077 /CH0346 (SB0258/CH0347) Condominiums - Claims Against Developers and Vendors - Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Environment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0279 /CH0104 Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 (SB0338) State Personnel – Grievance Procedures Delegate Haynes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0667 (SB0408) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 (SB0398) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0811 /CH0022 (SB0819/CH0029) Education - Collective Bargaining - Exclusive Representative's Access to New Employee Processing Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22
Ways and Means
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0913 /CH0395 (SB0607/CH0394) Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1086 Real Property - New Residential Construction - Correction of Drainage Defect Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1731 Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0258 /CH0347 (HB0077/CH0346) Condominiums – Claims Against Developers and Vendors – Unenforceability of Certain Provisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 347
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0338 (HB0335) State Personnel – Grievance Procedures Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0398 (HB0747) Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0408 (HB0667) Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0607 /CH0394 (HB0913/CH0395) Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings Provisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 394
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0819 /CH0029 (HB0811/CH0022) Education – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative’s Access to New Employee Processing Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:48 PM