Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0379)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 /CH0691 (SB0766)
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705)
Title
Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 /CH0736
Title
Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042)
Title
State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 (HB0068)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374)
Title
Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB0725/CH0691)
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049
Title
Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0042 (SB0094/CH0005) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0068 (SB0379) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0140 Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0588 /CH0243 (SB0698/CH0244) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0648 /CH0374 (SB0652) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Delegate Bagnall 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0725 /CH0691 (SB0766) Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691
Ways and Means
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0766 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB1275 Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB1284 /CH0402 (SB0705) Organ Donation - Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Finance
HB1346 /CH0736 Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - Establishment Delegate Haynes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 /CH0005 (HB0042) State Government - Consumer Price Index - Revised Statutory References President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 5
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0379 (HB0068) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Powers of Council of Unit Owners Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0652 (HB0648/CH0374) Interstate Physical Therapy Licensure Compact Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 /CH0244 (HB0588/CH0243) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB0725/CH0691) Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1049 Civil Actions - Office of Asbestos Case Mediation and Resolution Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (96-36)
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM