Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mediation -see also- Arbitration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204 (SB0993)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1623
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823
Title
Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1204)
Title
County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1204 (SB0993) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1463 Correctional Services - Inmates - Intake and Release Requirements (Reentry Success Act of 2020) Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1623 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0823 Sheriff of Baltimore City - Salaries and Collective Bargaining Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0993 (HB1204) County Boards and Public and Nonpublic Prekindergarten Programs and Schools – Discrimination – Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/14/2020 1:44 PM