Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Examiners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874
Title
Criminal Procedure - Homicide Investigations - Procedures (Joseph's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 (SB0920)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 (HB1482)
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0874 Criminal Procedure - Homicide Investigations - Procedures (Joseph's Law) Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 (SB0920) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 (HB1482) Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM