Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Examiners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0422
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1179
Title
Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586
Title
State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee (Suicide Mortality Review and Prevention Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917
Title
Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0422 Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1179 Public Health - Unborn Human Beings and Infants (Humane Disposition of Human Remains Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1586 State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners - Appointments Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0789 Public Health - Maryland Suicide Fatality Review Committee (Suicide Mortality Review and Prevention Act of 2020) Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 Transport of a Body After Anatomical Gift - Fees - Prohibition Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/9/2020 7:10 PM