Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0034)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395 (SB0702)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Expression of Regret or Apology - Inadmissibility
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996
Title
Admissibility of Writings or Records of Health Care Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0789)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 (SB0798)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1363 (SB0832)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0283)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399)
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0395)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 (HB1009)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0798 (HB1337)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832 (HB1363)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 Health Occupations - Sexual Orientation Change Efforts - Prohibited Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0283 (SB0034) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 (SB0702) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 /CH0399 (SB0314/CH0153) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Delegate Oaks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0635 Health Care Malpractice - Expression of Regret or Apology - Inadmissibility Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic Damages Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0996 Admissibility of Writings or Records of Health Care Providers Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0789) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 (SB0798) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1363 (SB0832) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0034 (HB0283) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 /CH0153 (HB0402/CH0399) Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB0395) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 (HB1009) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0798 (HB1337) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0832 (HB1363) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM