Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0398
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 (SB0188)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Certificates and Reports of Qualified Experts
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0569)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393)
Title
Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127
Title
Health Care Malpractice - Certificate and Report of Qualified Expert - Objection
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of Intent
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0402)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0479
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 (HB0724)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 Medical Professional Liability Insurance for Nonprofit Health Care Providers MC 4-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0398 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0402 (SB0188) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0470 Health Care Malpractice - Certificates and Reports of Qualified Experts Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0492 Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0724 (SB0569) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 Health Care Malpractice - Limitation on Noneconomic Damages Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393) Maryland Home Birth Safety Act Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0127 Health Care Malpractice - Certificate and Report of Qualified Expert - Objection Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0143 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of Intent Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0402) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0479 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0569 (HB0724) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM