Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0377 (SB0513)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606
Title
Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0691)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 (SB0849)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0574)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1487 /CH0210 (SB0450/CH0209)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0209 (HB1487/CH0210)
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0377)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Civil Actions - Offers of Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0869)
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Medical Malpractice - Discovery
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0644)
Title
Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0958/CH0499)
Title
Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0814)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0377 (SB0513) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0606 Patient Safety Early Intervention Programs Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0644 (SB0691) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0814 (SB0849) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0869 (SB0574) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act) Delegate Vogt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1487 /CH0210 (SB0450/CH0209) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Economic Matters
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 /CH0209 (HB1487/CH0210) Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Scope of Coverage Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0513 (HB0377) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0565 Civil Actions - Offers of Judgment Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0869) Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Medical Malpractice - Discovery Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 (HB0644) Public Health - Provision of Life-Preserving Health Care Services (Vulnerable Protection Act) Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0958/CH0499) Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0849 (HB0814) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM