Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0604 (SB0802)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0783)
Title
Patient Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 (SB0877)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0225
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB0777)
Title
Patient Early Intervention Programs
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 (HB0604)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1347)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0604 (SB0802) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 (SB0783) Patient Early Intervention Programs Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 (SB0877) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2017 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0225 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0783 (HB0777) Patient Early Intervention Programs Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 (HB0604) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Venue - Health Care Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1347) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB1037 Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM