Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Malpractice

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0113
Title
Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 (SB0869)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 (SB0784)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0106
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0322
Title
Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323
Title
Medical Malpractice - Discovery
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 /CH0525
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1323)
Title
Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813
Title
Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1320)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 /CH0113 Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Mandated Deductible Levels - Limitation Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Economic Matters
1/31/2019 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 (SB0869) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1323 (SB0784) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0106 Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0322 Medical Malpractice - Notice of Intent to File Claim Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0323 Medical Malpractice - Discovery Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0773 /CH0525 Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1323) Civil Actions - Health Care Malpractice Claims (Life Care Act 2019) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0813 Personal Injury or Wrongful Death - Noneconomic Damages Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0869 (HB1320) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM