Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 (SB0109/CH0442)
Title
Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Research - Synthetic Cannabinoids
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0399 (SB0287)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior Resources
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0384)
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0368)
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0851 (SB0651)
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 (SB0708)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1100
Title
Maryland Compassionate Care Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101 /CH0403
Title
Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0249 (SB0380/CH0248)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0442 (HB0267)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0399)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior Resources
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0779)
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0380 /CH0248 (HB1343/CH0249)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 (HB0726)
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0651 (HB0851)
Title
Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0948)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0267 (SB0109/CH0442) Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Research - Synthetic Cannabinoids Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0399 (SB0287) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior Resources Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB0726 (SB0384) Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 (SB0368) Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0851 (SB0651) Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Penalties Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 (SB0708) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1100 Maryland Compassionate Care Act Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1101 /CH0403 Medical Marijuana - Academic Medical Centers - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1343 /CH0249 (SB0380/CH0248) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0109 /CH0442 (HB0267) Criminal Law - Cannabimimetic Agents - Prohibition Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0399) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Institutes for Behavior Resources Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0368 (HB0779) Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0380 /CH0248 (HB1343/CH0249) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup on Cancer Clusters and Environmental Causes of Cancer Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0384 (HB0726) Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0651 (HB0851) Criminal Law - Synthetic Cannabinoids - Penalties Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0948) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM