Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0169
Title
Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0580)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 (SB0862)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1510 /CH0460
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0467
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580 (HB1236)
Title
Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB1347)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0169 Health Insurance - Rollback of Federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act Conforming Provisions Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1236 (SB0580) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1321 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission - Treatment, Certification, Licensing, and Registration Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1347 (SB0862) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1510 /CH0460 Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
SB0467 Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0580 (HB1236) Health - Reporting of Death and Burial or Disposal of Body - Requirements and Penalties Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0862 (HB1347) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM