Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0435 (SB0013/CH0436)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0655 (SB0392)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598 /CH0797
Title
Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1804 /CH0590
Title
Health – Medical Research Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0655)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1151
Title
Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Alteration
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0115 /CH0435 (SB0013/CH0436) Maryland Health Care Commission - Electronic Prescription Records System - Assessment and Report Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0655 (SB0392) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0839 Public Health - State Advisory Council on PANDAS and PANS Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1207 Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1598 /CH0797 Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display Requirements Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 797
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1804 /CH0590 Health – Medical Research Funding Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 590
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0655) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1151 Income Tax - Biotechnology Investment Incentive Tax Credit - Alteration Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM