Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Medical Research

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 (SB0313)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254
Title
University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 (SB0265)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0611 (SB0282)
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0706
Title
Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0736 (SB0571)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810 (SB0706)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0741)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925
Title
Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 (HB0301)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 (HB0611)
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB0119)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0736)
Title
Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706 (HB0810)
Title
Health Occupations – Pharmacists – Laboratory Tests
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0836)
Title
COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0119 (SB0313) Maryland Department of Health – Public Health Outreach Programs – Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer’s Disease, and Other Types of Dementia Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0254 University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0301 (SB0265) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2021 - 4:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0611 (SB0282) Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0706 Medical Cannabis – Dispensary Grower–Processor License Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0736 (SB0571) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0810 (SB0706) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Laboratory Tests Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0836 (SB0741) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0925 Workgroup on Medical Cannabis Use by Pregnant and Nursing Women Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0265 (HB0301) Estates and Trusts - Maryland Revised Uniform Anatomical Gift Act - Revisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0282 (HB0611) Public Health - Prohibition on Testing Cosmetics on Animals Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0313 (HB0119) Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0571 (HB0736) Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact President 3 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0706 (HB0810) Health Occupations – Pharmacists – Laboratory Tests Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0836) COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-30)
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page