Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0251
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0602 (SB0320/CH0024)
Title
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 (SB0511)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 /CH0024 (HB0602)
Title
University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 (HB0961)
Title
Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0490 /CH0251 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0602 (SB0320/CH0024) University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids Delegate Glenn 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 (SB0511) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1248 Medical Schools - Use of Animals in Medical Training - Prohibited Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0057 (HB0072/CH0489) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0320 /CH0024 (HB0602) University of Maryland School of Medicine - Workgroup to Study Issues Related to Uterine Fibroids Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0511 (HB0961) Women's Late-Term Pregnancy Health Act Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM