Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371 /CH0203 (SB0175/CH0204)
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0544)
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207
Title
Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Health Occupations – Practice of Optometry – Therapeutically Certified Optometrists
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 /CH0658
Title
Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0204 (HB0371/CH0203)
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0879)
Title
Health Occupations - Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0371 /CH0203 (SB0175/CH0204) Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 (SB0544) Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1207 Public Health - Ibogaine Treatment Study Program Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1296 Health Occupations – Practice of Optometry – Therapeutically Certified Optometrists Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0062 /CH0658 Maryland Chiropractic Act - Revisions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 658
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 /CH0204 (HB0371/CH0203) Emergency Medical Services - Emergency Medical Services Board - Appointments Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 (HB0879) Health Occupations - Advanced Practice Dental Hygiene Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM