Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 (SB0187)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0858)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 /CH0445 (SB0733)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB0497)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 (HB0383)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538
Title
Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 /CH0018
Title
University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733 (HB0924/CH0445)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 (HB0881)
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0897 /CH0765
Title
University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0383 (SB0187) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0881 (SB0858) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0924 /CH0445 (SB0733) State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 (SB0497) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0187 (HB0383) Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 Health - Hospital-Based Facilities - Disclosure of Facility Fees Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0619 /CH0018 University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Finance
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0733 (HB0924/CH0445) State Board of Physicians - Registered Cardiovascular Invasive Specialists Senator Zucker 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 (HB0881) Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Academic Research - Medical Uses and Properties of Cannabis Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0897 /CH0765 University of Maryland Joint Steering Council – Renaming, Duties, and Funding Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 765
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2019 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM