Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Medical Schools

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0692/CH0575)
Title
Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 /CH0262 (SB0450/CH0263)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819 (SB0768)
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 /CH0263 (HB0580/CH0262)
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 /CH0575 (HB0551)
Title
Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0733
Title
Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0819)
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0788
Title
Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0551 (SB0692/CH0575) Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0560 /CH0612 (SB0395/CH0613) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0580 /CH0262 (SB0450/CH0263) Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 262
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0819 (SB0768) Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0395 /CH0613 (HB0560/CH0612) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0450 /CH0263 (HB0580/CH0262) Maryland Department of Health – Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories in Frederick County Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 263
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0511 Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 /CH0575 (HB0551) Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0733 Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB0819) Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0788 Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:27 PM