Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mergers and Acquisitions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0298 /CH0263 (SB0335) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0551 (SB0713/CH0550) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Economic Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0335 (HB0298/CH0263) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model Contract President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 /CH0550 (HB0916/CH0551) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM