Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mergers and Acquisitions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0250 (SB0207)
Title
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0472/CH0250)
Title
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256)
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0472 /CH0250 (SB0207) Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Economic Matters
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0522 /CH0256 (SB0681) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0207 (HB0472/CH0250) Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0681 (HB0522/CH0256) Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM