Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mergers and Acquisitions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 /CH0721
Title
Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0289
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1105 /CH0721 Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition Delegate Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0289 Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM