Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Mergers and Acquisitions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 /CH0060 (SB0165/CH0061)
Title
Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 /CH0061 (HB0117/CH0060)
Title
Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0117 /CH0060 (SB0165/CH0061) Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 60
Economic Matters
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0668 /CH0292 (SB0469/CH0293) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 292
Economic Matters
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0165 /CH0061 (HB0117/CH0060) Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 61
Finance
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0469 /CH0293 (HB0668/CH0292) Corporations and Associations - Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 293
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2020 - 12:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:59 PM