Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Midwives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393)
Title
Maryland Home Birth Safety Act
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269)
Title
Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 /CH0393 (SB0105) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0716 /CH0269 (SB0347) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0105 (HB0009/CH0393) Maryland Home Birth Safety Act Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0347 (HB0716/CH0269) Health Occupations - Prescriber-Pharmacist Agreements and Therapy Management Contracts Senator Pugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page