Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Midwives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0018
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0520 /CH0661 (SB0406/CH0662)
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075
Title
Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 (SB0869)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0406 /CH0662 (HB0520/CH0661)
Title
Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB1320)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0018 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0520 /CH0661 (SB0406/CH0662) Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination - Grant Funding and Task Force Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
HB1075 Health - Informed Consent (Woman's Right to Know Act) Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 (SB0869) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0406 /CH0662 (HB0520/CH0661) Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination – Grant Funding and Task Force Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0869 (HB1320) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM