Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Midwives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0914)
Title
Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Abortion - Ultrasound Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1400
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1067)
Title
Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1067 (SB0914) Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Abortion - Ultrasound Requirement Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1400 Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0110 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0914 (HB1067) Doulas - Doula Technical Assistance Advisory Group and Certification Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 8:48 AM