Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Military Department

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Public Safety - State Militia
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 /CH0182
Title
Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0013 Public Safety - State Militia Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 /CH0182 Collective Bargaining - Firefighters - Martin State Airport Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM