Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Military Department

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482
Title
Military Department – Study on Assisting Active Duty Service Members With State Law and Regulatory Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 /CH0516
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0721
Title
Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139)
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1139 (SB1010/CH0592) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1482 Military Department – Study on Assisting Active Duty Service Members With State Law and Regulatory Compliance Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 Public Safety - Maryland Cyber Reserve - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0081 /CH0516 State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2020 - 3:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
SB0721 Emergency Management - Chief Resilience Officer - Appointment and Duties Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 /CH0592 (HB1139) Public Safety - Maryland Code of Military Justice Senator Peters 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:32 PM