Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Militia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770
Title
Income Tax - Military Retirement Income
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1005
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Retired Military
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1011
Title
Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1228 /CH0372 (SB1070/CH0371)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 /CH0183
Title
National Guard - Tuition Assistance - Members of Disbanded Units
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 /CH0371 (HB1228/CH0372)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0770 Income Tax - Military Retirement Income Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1005 Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Retired Military Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1011 Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2014 Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
HB1228 /CH0372 (SB1070/CH0371) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0610 /CH0183 National Guard - Tuition Assistance - Members of Disbanded Units Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 /CH0371 (HB1228/CH0372) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM