Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Milk Products

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0003
Title
Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0750)
Title
Food Service Facilities - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 (HB1255)
Title
Food Service Facilities - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0003 Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1255 (SB0750) Food Service Facilities - Meals for Children Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 (HB1255) Food Service Facilities - Meals for Children Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM