Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Milk Products

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 /CH0015 (SB0122/CH0014)
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 (SB0742)
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0014 (HB0540/CH0015)
Title
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0742 (HB1090)
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 /CH0015 (SB0122/CH0014) Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 (SB0742) Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0008 Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
SB0122 /CH0014 (HB0540/CH0015) Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - Revisions Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0742 (HB1090) Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM