Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Milk Products

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079
Title
Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0564
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1498 (SB0602)
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB1498)
Title
Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 Health - Milk Products - Raw Milk - Consumer-Owned Livestock Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0564 Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1498 (SB0602) Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Public Health - Restaurants - Meals for Children Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0602 (HB1498) Maryland Healthy Vending Machine Act Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM