Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Mining

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0136
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 /CH0137
Title
Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 /CH0136 Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies Delegate Wivell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0054 /CH0137 Surface Mining – Zone of Dewatering Influence – Remedies Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM