Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Minorities -see also- Women

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 /CH0221 (SB0542)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549 /CH0602
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 /CH0410
Title
Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1194 (SB1039)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Procurement - Real Estate Development Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1223 (SB0970)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315
Title
Minority Business Participation - Liquidated Damages Provisions - Exclusion for Architectural and Engineering Services Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318 (SB0972)
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1447 (SB0934)
Title
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 (HB0294/CH0221)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240)
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1447)
Title
State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970 (HB1223)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB1318)
Title
Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination Extension
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Montgomery County - Warren Historical Site - Loving Charity Hall
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International Education
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1194)
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Parity and Investment
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0294 /CH0221 (SB0542) Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law) Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Judiciary
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0547 Minority Business Enterprises - Study and Report Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB0549 /CH0602 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Juneteenth National Freedom Day Delegate Stukes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 /CH0410 Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0881 /CH0240 (SB0923/CH0256) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Delegate Glenn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1194 (SB1039) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Evaluation Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Procurement - Real Estate Development Projects - Minority Business Enterprise Participation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1223 (SB0970) Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1315 Minority Business Participation - Liquidated Damages Provisions - Exclusion for Architectural and Engineering Services Contracts Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1318 (SB0972) Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination Extension Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1447 (SB0934) State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0542 (HB0294/CH0221) Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements (Christopher's Law) Senator Muse 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0923 /CH0256 (HB0881/CH0240) Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1447) State Aid Reporting Requirement - Nonprofit Entities - Minority Business Participation Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0970 (HB1223) Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0972 (HB1318) Evaluation of the Application of Minority Business Enterprise Program by the Public Service Commission - Data Collection and Termination Extension Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0990 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Montgomery County - Warren Historical Site - Loving Charity Hall Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1000 Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International Education Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1039 (HB1194) Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Parity and Investment Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM